EP1416560 - OPERATING METHOD OF FUEL CELL AND POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMOTO, Kazutoshi, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Rupp, Christian, Dipl.-Phys. Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02736185.6 | 27.06.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002JP06486 | Priority number, date | JP20010239976 | 07.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001239976 | [2004/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03015203 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416560 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/10 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
H01M8/04522 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/04119 (EP,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
H01M8/04156 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLE UND STROMVERSORGUNG | [2004/19] | English: | OPERATING METHOD OF FUEL CELL AND POWER SUPPLY | [2004/19] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION DE PILES A COMBUSTIBLE ET ALIMENTATION | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2003 | Translation filed | 14.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 16.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1150282 (ENERGY CONVERSION LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 68-70 * * page 3, lines 30-36 *; | [X]EP0716463 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11 * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 22 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US5853910 (TOMIOKA NORIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, lines 53-65 ** column 5, lines 17-24 * | International search | [X]US5853910 (TOMIOKA NORIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]WO9905741 (EMPRISE CORP [US], et al); | [XP]EP1132986 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]JP2002175821 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) |