EP1443836 - CARRIER DEVICE FOR AN ENGINE POWERED TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget Electrolux 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUNDBERG, Leena Solvägen 6 S-554 66 Jönköping / SE | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/16] | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Albihns Stockholm AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02736384.5 | 30.05.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002SE01057 | Priority number, date | SE20010001921 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: SE 0101921 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02096238 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1443836 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1443836 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A45F5/14 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
A45F3/14 (EP,US);
Y10S224/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN MASCHINENGETRIEBENES WERKZEUG | [2004/33] | English: | CARRIER DEVICE FOR AN ENGINE POWERED TOOL | [2004/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT POUR UN OUTIL MOTORISE | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | 16.04.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.02.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2011 | BE | 20.07.2011 | CY | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | IT | 20.07.2011 | NL | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 20.07.2011 | |
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 20.07.2011 | |
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 20.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4776504 (PANTH ERIK [SE]); | [A]EP0826324 (STIHL MASCHF ANDREAS [DE]) |