EP1390373 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 4-AMINO-1-HYDROXYBUTYLIDENE-1, 1-BIPHOSPHONIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EOS Eczacibasi Ozgun Kimyasal Urunler Sanayi Ve Ti Caret A.S. Buyukdere Caddesi, Ali Kaya Sokak No. 7, Levent 80640 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states EOS Eczacibasi Ozgun Kimyasal Urunler Sanayi Ve Ti Caret A.S. Buyukdere Caddesi, Ali Kaya Sokak No. 7, Levent 80640 Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DABAK, Kadir, Buyukdere Caddesi Ali Kaya Sokak No. 7, Levent 80640 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
OZARSLAN, A., Evren, Buyukdere Caddesi Ali Kaya Sokak No. 7, Levent 80640 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
SAHBAZ, Filiz, Buyukdere Caddesi Ali Kaya Sokak No. 7, Levent 80640 Istanbul / TR | 04 /
ASLAN, Tuncer, Buyukdere Caddesi Ali Kaya Sokak No. 7, Levent 80640 Istanbul / TR | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Erkan, et al Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Sevinç, Erkan, et al Istanbul Patent & Trademark Consultancy Ltd. Plaza-33, Buyukdere cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | ||
Former [2004/09] | Sevinç, Erkan, et al Istanbul Patent & Trademark Consultancy Ltd., Patent, Büyükdere Cad. Gün Apt. No: 26/16 Mecidiyeköy 80290 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 02736468.6 | 08.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002TR00018 | Priority number, date | TR20010001250 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: TR 200101250 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02090367 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1390373 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1390373 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1390373 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | [2006/26] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1390373 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
C07F9/3873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 4-AMINO-1-HYDROXYBUTYLIDEN-1,1-BISPHOSPHONSÄURE | [2004/09] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 4-AMINO-1-HYDROXYBUTYLIDENE-1, 1-BIPHOSPHONIC ACID | [2004/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDE 4-AMINO-1-HYDROXYBUTYLIDENE-1, 1-BIPHOSPHONIQUE | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 17.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2005 | BE | 14.12.2005 | CH | 14.12.2005 | CY | 14.12.2005 | LI | 14.12.2005 | DK | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | IE | 08.05.2006 | LU | 08.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
LU | 08.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 14.12.2005 | |
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 14.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4922007 (KIECZYKOWSKI GERARD R [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9834940 (APOTEX INC [CA], et al) [DA] 1-8* the whole document * |