EP1372844 - HIGH ACTIVITY METAL CARBENE METATHESIS CATALYSTS GENERATED USING A THERMALLY ACTIVATED N-HETEROCYCLIC CARBENE PRECURSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1200 East California Boulevard Pasadena, CA 92115 / US | For all designated states Materia, Inc. 60 North San Gabriel Boulevard Pasadena, CA 91107 / US | [2011/01] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states California Institute of Technology 1200 East California Boulevard Pasadena, California 92115 / US | ||
For all designated states Materia, Inc. 60 North San Gabriel Boulevard Pasadena, CA 91107 / US | |||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states California Institute of Technology 1200 East California Boulevard Pasadena, California 92115 / US | ||
For all designated states Cymetech, LLC 2629 State Highway 75 South Huntsville, TX 77340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Andrew 1511 Lewis Drive Lakewood, OH / US | 02 /
GRUBBS, Robert, H. 1700 Spruce Street S.Pasadena, CA / US | 03 /
MORGAN, John, P. 4001 Laurel Avenue Moosic, PA 18507 / US | 04 /
MOORE, Jason, L. 10 Bowden Road, Apt. E Huntsville, TX / US | [2005/21] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
BELL, Andrew 1511 Lewis Drive Lakewood, OH / US | ||
02 /
GRUBBS, Robert, H. 1700 Spruce Street S.Pasadena, CA / US | |||
03 /
MORGAN, John, P. 2148 Crary Street Pasadena, CA 91104 / US | |||
04 /
MOORE, Jason, L. 10 Bowden Road, Apt. E Huntsville, TX / US | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Andrae, Steffen Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Andrae, Steffen, Dr. Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02736516.2 | 25.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US09273 | Priority number, date | US20010278311P | 23.03.2001 Original published format: US 278311 P | US20010288680P | 03.05.2001 Original published format: US 288680 P | US20020360775P | 01.03.2002 Original published format: US 360775 P | [2006/09] |
Former [2004/13] | US20010278311P | 23.03.2001 | |
US20010288680P | 03.05.2001 | ||
US20010288680P | 03.05.2001 | ||
Former [2004/01] | US20010278311P | 23.03.2001 | |
US20010288680P | 03.05.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02076613 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372844 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372844 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/00, B01J27/24, C08F4/44, C08F4/80, C07D233/00, C07D233/02, C07D233/54, C07D233/56, C07D233/58, B01J31/22, C07C6/04, C07C6/06, C07F15/00 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
B01J31/2265 (EP);
B01J31/2273 (EP);
B01J31/24 (EP);
B01J31/2404 (EP);
C07C6/04 (EP);
C07C6/06 (EP);
C07F15/002 (EP);
C07F15/0046 (EP);
B01J2231/543 (EP);
B01J23/462 (EP);
B01J23/466 (EP);
B01J2531/821 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | B01J31/00, B01J27/24, C08F4/44, C08F4/80, C07D233/00, C07D233/02, C07D233/54, C07D233/56, C07D233/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES THERMISCH AKTIVIERTEN N-HETEROCYCLISCHEN CARBENVORLÄUFERS GEBILDETE HOCHAKTIVE METALLCARBENMETATHESEKATALYSATOREN | [2004/01] | English: | HIGH ACTIVITY METAL CARBENE METATHESIS CATALYSTS GENERATED USING A THERMALLY ACTIVATED N-HETEROCYCLIC CARBENE PRECURSOR | [2004/01] | French: | CATALYSEURS METALLIQUES DE METATHESE DE CARBENE A HAUTE ACTIVITE GENERES AU MOYEN D'UN PRECURSEUR DE CARBENE N-HETEROCYCLIQUE ACTIVE DE MANIERE THERMIQUE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2011 | BE | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | IT | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | IE | 25.03.2011 | LU | 25.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | ES | 16.04.2011 | PT | 05.05.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.03.2011 | ||
LU | 25.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | SE | 05.01.2011 | |
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO02079208 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al) [E] 1-52* the whole document *; | [Y] - SCHOLL M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND ACTIVITY OF A NEW GENERATION OF RUTHENIUM-BASED OLEFIN METATHESIS CATALYSTS COORDINATED WITH 1,3-DIMESITYL-4,5-DIHYDROIMIDAZ OL-2-YLIDENE LIGANDS", ORGANIC LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (1999), vol. 1, no. 6, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 953 - 956, XP000984756 [Y] 1-25,29-52 * page 954, column L, paragraph 1 - page 955, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol990909q | [Y] - MORGAN, J.P. ET AL., "In situ preparation of a highly active N-heterocyclic carbene-coordinated olefin metathesis catalyst", ORGANIC LETTERS, (2000), vol. 2, no. 20, pages 3153 - 3155, XP002335543 [Y] 1-25,29-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol0063510 | [Y] - SCHUERER S C ET AL, "Synthesis and Application of a Permanently Immobilized Olefin-Metathesis Catalyst", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, VERLAG CHEMIE. WEINHEIM, DE, (2000), vol. 39, no. 21, ISSN 0570-0833, pages 3898 - 3901, XP002212736 [Y] 1-25,29-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3773(20001103)39:21<3898::AID-ANIE3898>3.0.CO;2-X | [Y] - JAFARPOUR L NOLAN S P, "SIMPLE AND CONVENIENT SYNTHETIC PROCEDURE LEADING TO RUTHENIUM OLEFIN METATHESIS CATALYSTS BEARING THE N,N-BIS(MESITYL)IMIDAZOL-2-YLIDENE (IMES) LIGAND", ORGANOMETALLICS, ACS, COLUMBUS, OH, US, (20000529), vol. 19, no. 11, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 2055 - 2057, XP002957488 [Y] 26-28 * page 2355, paragraph L - page 2356, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om000203w | [Y] - ARDUENGO A J ET AL, "C-H insertion reactions of nucleophilic carbenes", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. BASEL, CH, (1999), vol. 82, no. 12, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 2348 - 2364, XP002958853 [Y] 26-28 * page 2056; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2675(19991215)82:12<2348::AID-HLCA2348>3.0.CO;2-M | International search | [Y]DE4447066 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [Y]US6025496 (HERRMANN WOLFGANG A [DE], et al); | [Y]US6107420 (GRUBBS ROBERT H [US], et al); | [Y]WO0071554 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al); | [Y] - HERRMANN, W.A. ET AL., "A novel class of ruthenium catalysts for olefin metathesis", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1998), vol. 37, no. 18, pages 2490 - 2493, XP002951798 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3773(19981002)37:18<2490::AID-ANIE2490>3.3.CO;2-O | [Y] - T.M. TRNKA ET AL., "The development of L2X2Ru=CHR olefin metathesis catalysts: an organometallic success story", ACC. CHEM. RES., (200101), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 18 - 29, XP002951799 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar000114f |