EP1509323 - FISCHER-TROPSCH CATALYST PREPARED WITH A HIGH PURITY IRON PRECURSOR METHOD OF PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/09] | FISCHER-TROPSCH CATALYST PREPARED WITH A HIGH PURITY IRON PRECURSOR | ||
[2006/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 80333 München / DE | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, X., D. 7201 Wood Briar Road Louisville, Kentucky 40241 / US | 02 /
O'BRIEN, Robert, J. 703 Bell Rock Place Louisville, Kentucky 40243 / US | 03 /
TUELL, Richard 7450 Depauw Church Road S.E. Elizabeth, Indiana 47117 / US | 04 /
CONCA, Esterino Via Monte Grappa, 8 28100 Novara / IT | 05 /
RUBINI, Carlo Via de Cristoferis, 21 22020 San Fermo dell Battaglia (Como) / IT | 06 /
PETRINI, Guido Via C. Battisti, 39/A 28066 Galliate (Novara) / IT | [2006/28] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
HU, X., D. 7201 Wood Briar Road Louisville, KY 40241 / US | ||
02 /
O'BRIEN, Robert, J. 218 Charlestown Court Louisville, KY 40243 / US | |||
03 /
TUELL, Richard . . / US | |||
04 /
CONCA, Esterino via Monte Grappa ,8 28100 Novara (NOVARA) / US | Representative(s) | Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Westendorp, Michael, Dr. Patentanwälte Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02736844.8 | 15.05.2002 | [2005/09] | WO2002US15310 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03097236 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509323 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509323 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/04, B01J37/12, B01J23/745, B01J23/78, B01J23/72, C10G2/00, C07C1/04 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
C10G2/332 (EP,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | B01J37/04, B01J37/12, B01J23/745, B01J23/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT HOCHREINEM EISENVORLÄUFER HERGESTELLTER FISCHER-TROPSCH-KATALYSATOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/38] | English: | FISCHER-TROPSCH CATALYST PREPARED WITH A HIGH PURITY IRON PRECURSOR METHOD OF PREPARATION | [2006/38] | French: | CATALYSEUR FISCHER-TROPSCH PREPARE AU MOYEN D'UN PRECURSEUR DU FER DE GRANDE PURETE ET METHODE DE PREPARATION | [2006/38] |
Former [2005/09] | MIT HOCHREINEM EISENVORLÄUFER HERGESTELLTER FISCHER-TROPSCH-KATALYSATOR | ||
Former [2005/09] | FISCHER-TROPSCH CATALYST PREPARED WITH A HIGH PURITY IRON PRECURSOR | ||
Former [2005/09] | CATALYSEUR FISCHER-TROPSCH PREPARE AU MOYEN D'UN PRECURSEUR DU FER DE GRANDE PURETE | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.12.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.07.2007 | CH | 25.07.2007 | CY | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | LI | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | ES | 05.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | BE | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CH | 25.07.2007 | |
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | ES | 05.11.2007 | |
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 05.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1226876 (NIPPON ELECTRIC COMPANY) [A] 24 * example 5; claims 1,3,4 *; | [XA]US3711426 (JORGENSEN M) [X] 12,24 * column 1, line 25 - line 30 * * column 2, line 35 - line 42 * * column 3, line 10 - line 24 * * claim 1 * [A] 1-23,25-35; | [A]US5863856 (MAULDIN CHARLES H [US]) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [E]EP1350765 (SUED CHEMIE MT SRL [IT]) [E] 1-35 * paragraphs [0014] , [0026] , [0032] - [0035] *; | [T]US2004235652 (SMITH DENNIS J [US], et al) [T] 1-35 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] * * claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US3892897 (RITTLER HERMANN L); | [Y]US4343724 (ANTOS GEORGE J); | [Y]US4414133 (OTAKE MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4499204 (VANDERSPURT THOMAS H [US], et al); | [Y]US5863856 (MAULDIN CHARLES H [US]); | [Y]US6183658 (LESNIAK CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) |