EP1388193 - BRUSHLESS MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThinGap Corporation 1169 Harbor Hills Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | [2005/26] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states G & G Technology, Inc. 1169 Harbor Hills Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Gregory, S. 281 Agnus Street Ventura, CA 93003 / US | 02 /
YANKIE, Gerald, W. 1169 Harbor Hills Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott, Will & Emery, 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02736936.2 | 15.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002US15645 | Priority number, date | US20010291704P | 16.05.2001 Original published format: US 291704 P | US20020354792P | 06.02.2002 Original published format: US 354792 P | US20020125809 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: US 125809 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02093713 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1388193 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/22 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
H02K1/27 (EP,US);
H02K1/2788 (EP,US);
H02K21/12 (EP,US);
H02K3/26 (EP,US);
H02K3/47 (EP,US);
H02K1/274 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BÜRSTENLOSER MOTOR | [2004/07] | English: | BRUSHLESS MOTOR | [2004/07] | French: | MOTEUR SANS BALAIS | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3312846 (JACQUES HENRY-BAUDOT) [Y] 1-6,10-18,20,22,23 * column 1, line 9 - line 33 * * column 1, line 71 - column 2, line 31 * [A] 8,9,25; | [XY]DE3607289 (PAPST MOTOREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-18,20,22-24 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-23,25; | [XA]EP0670621 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,10-13,15,20,22 * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 4; figures 1b,2,4,5 *[A] 2,5,7-9,16-19,21; | [Y]US6111329 (GRAHAM GREGORY S [US], et al) [Y] 7-9,19,21,25 * column 5, line 52 - column 7, line 49; figures 1a-5,9 * | International search | [Y]US3324323 (JACQUES HENRY-BAUDOT); | [X]US5004944 (FISHER GENE ALLEN [US]) |