EP1399898 - ALARM SYSTEMS, ALARM DEVICES, ALARM ACTIVATION METHODS, ALARM SYSTEM RETROFITTING METHODS, AND ALARM SYSTEM NETWORK ESTABLISHMENT METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merrell, Daniel B. 3652 E. Dartmouth Mesa, AZ 85205 / US | For all designated states Goetz, Joseph R. 550 East Encinas Avenue Gilbert, AZ / US | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02737186.3 | 23.05.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002US16616 | Priority number, date | US20010293641P | 24.05.2001 Original published format: US 293641 P | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02095701 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399898 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399898 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G08B1/08, G08B25/10 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
G08B19/005 (EP,US);
G08B1/08 (EP,US);
G08B25/10 (EP,US);
G08B5/226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/13] | G08B1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALARMSYSTEME, ALARMEINRICHTUNGEN, ALARMAKTIVIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN ZUR NACHTRÄGLICHEN INSTALLATION EINES ALARMSYSTEMS UND ALARMSYSTEMNETZWERKEINRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2004/13] | English: | ALARM SYSTEMS, ALARM DEVICES, ALARM ACTIVATION METHODS, ALARM SYSTEM RETROFITTING METHODS, AND ALARM SYSTEM NETWORK ESTABLISHMENT METHODS | [2004/13] | French: | SYSTEMES D'ALARME, DISPOSITIFS D'ALARME, PROCEDES D'ACTIVATION D'ALARME, PROCEDES D'ADAPTATION DE SYSTEMES D'ALARME ET PROCEDES D'ETABLISSEMENT DE RESEAUX DE SYSTEMES D'ALARME | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 02.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2006 | BE | 18.01.2006 | CH | 18.01.2006 | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | FR | 18.01.2006 | IT | 18.01.2006 | LI | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | DE | 19.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | IE | 23.05.2006 | LU | 23.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
FR | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
LU | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
LU | 23.05.2006 | ||
FR | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
LU | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 29.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0939944 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0005] - [0013] *; | [XY]WO0122701 (CLIFFORD ROGER [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10,11,20 * abstract * * page 2, lines 20-28 * * page 3, lines 7-15 * * page 3, lines 20-30 * * page 5, lines 1-4 * * page 5, lines 11-16 * * page 5, lines 30-33 * * page 6, lines 5-7; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,9; | [Y]DE20101191U (LUH ERIC [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 1, line 3 ** page 1, lines 9-18; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US5400246 (WILSON DENNIS A [US], et al) |