EP1395228 - COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ROSEMARY EXTRACT AND DHA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-L Management Corp. 767 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10153 / US | [2004/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOKOLINSKY, Marina 35 Winston Drive Smithtown, NY 11787 / US | 02 /
OSTROVSKAYA, Asira 1 Bay Club Drive Bayside, NY 11360 / US | 03 /
LANDA, Peter, A. 36 Lewis Lane Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | 04 /
MAES, Daniel, H. 48 Knollwood Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/11] | Cabinet Hirsch Groupement 161 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02737222.6 | 29.05.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002US16766 | Priority number, date | US20010294093P | 29.05.2001 Original published format: US 294093 P | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02096371 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395228 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K7/42, A61K7/44, A61K35/78, A61K38/43 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
A61Q19/04 (EP,US);
A61K36/53 (EP);
A61K8/35 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/53, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT ROSMARINEXTRAKT UND DHA | [2004/11] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ROSEMARY EXTRACT AND DHA | [2004/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES A BASE D'EXTRAIT DE ROMARIN ET DE DHA | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2712804 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-20* example 1; claims 1-17 * | International search | [YP]US6316012 (N GUYEN QUANG LAN [FR], et al); | [Y]US5827506 (MCSHANE JAMES E [US], et al) |