EP1384099 - DEVICE FOR SQUARE EDGE MEMORY LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
IOLTECH 10 Avenue Paul Langevin 17180 Perigny / FR | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [2009/43] |
Former [2004/46] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
IOLTECH 10 Avenue Paul Langevin 17180 Perigny / FR | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | |||
Former [2004/23] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
IOLTECH SA Avenue Paul Langevin 17000 La Rochelle / FR | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | |||
Former [2004/05] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAI, Kok-Ming 999 Cavesson Terrace Lawrenceville, GA 30045 / US | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Lewitter, Herbert, et al Santarelli 12 avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Lewitter, Herbert, et al Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande-Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2004/05] | Grubb, Philip William Novartis AG, Patent & Trademark Department, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02737902.3 | 26.03.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002EP03388 | Priority number, date | US20010279195P | 27.03.2001 Original published format: US 279195 P | US20010334753P | 31.10.2001 Original published format: US 334753 P | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02082129 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1384099 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
B24B9/146 (EP,US);
B24B13/005 (EP,US);
G02B7/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR QUADRATISCHE MEMORY-LINSE | [2004/05] | English: | DEVICE FOR SQUARE EDGE MEMORY LENS | [2004/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LENTILLES A MEMOIRE DE FORME ET BORDS CARRES | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 23.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4580371 (AKHAVI DAVID S [US]) [Y] 1,10,12 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 39 * * column 4, lines 18-30; figure 3 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 51; figures 5,6 * [A] 2,4,7,9,11,13; | [Y]NL9402125 ; | [A]US4856234 (GOINS GARY D [US]) [A] 1,2,5,7 * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 58; figures 1-5 * * column 7, lines 20-27 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 10; figure 8 *; | [A]US4536732 (SCHINDL KLAUS [AT], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 1, lines 6-47 * * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4479332 (STERN THEODORE J [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 2, lines 8-21,53-55 * * column 5, lines 17-56; figure 3 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 31, Database accession no. 1996-308044, XP002241234 & NL9402125 A 19960701 (VAN DRUTEN R M) [Y] 1,10,12 * abstract * * page 2, lines 33-36; figures 1,2; claim 2 * |