EP1395448 - TYRE WITH DOUBLE-ANCHORING CASING PLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A. 10-12, route Louis-Braille CH-1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | |||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Sociéte de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A. 10-12, route Louis-Braille CH-1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUXERRE, Pascal 11, rue de la Pauze F-63130 Royat / FR | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Dequire, Philippe Jean-Marie Denis Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Dequire, Philippe M.F.P. Michelin, SGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02738087.2 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002EP05479 | Priority number, date | FR20010007199 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: FR 0107199 | [2004/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02094584 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395448 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395448 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/00, B60C15/024, B60C13/00 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
B60C15/0081 (EP,US);
B60C13/002 (EP,US);
B60C15/0018 (EP,US);
B60C15/024 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10828 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN MIT EINER KARKASSE, DIE ZWEIVERANKERUNG ENTHÄLT | [2004/11] | English: | TYRE WITH DOUBLE-ANCHORING CASING PLY | [2004/11] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE AVEC NAPPE CARCASSE A BI-ANCRAGE | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2005 | CY | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | IE | 14.09.2005 | NL | 14.09.2005 | TR | 14.09.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | SE | 14.12.2005 | ES | 25.12.2005 | PT | 14.02.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | CH | 31.05.2006 | LI | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
IE | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
TR | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
IE | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
IE | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
IE | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
IE | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
SE | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AY]US4057092 (TRACY FRANK R) [A] 1 * page 4, line 34 - line 47 * * figures 6,7 *[Y] 7; | [XY]WO9964225 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7 |