EP1411138 - NONORIENTED ELECTROMAGNETIC STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHNO, Masaaki, Intellectual Property Dept. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KAWANO, Masaki, Intellectual Property Dept. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
HONDA, Atsuhito, Intellectual Property Dept. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
FUJITA, Akio, Intellctual Property Dept. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02738812.3 | 27.06.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002JP06458 | Priority number, date | JP20010195832 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001195832 | [2004/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03002777 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1411138 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/06, C22C38/60, C21D9/46, B21B3/02, H01F1/16 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
C21D8/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (KR);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/008 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,US);
H01F1/147 (EP,US);
H01F1/14716 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHT ORIENTIERTES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES STAHLBLECH | [2004/17] | English: | NONORIENTED ELECTROMAGNETIC STEEL SHEET | [2004/17] | French: | FEUILLE EN ACIER ELECTROMAGNETIQUE NON ORIENTEE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2003 | Translation filed | 18.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05234736 ; | [X]JP4136138 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931215), vol. 0176, no. 83, Database accession no. (E - 1477), & JP5234736 A 19930910 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920831), vol. 0164, no. 11, Database accession no. (C - 0979), & JP4136138 A 19920511 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - DAVIS, J.R. & ASSOCIATES, Carbon and Alloy Steels, MATERIALS PARK, USA, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (1996), 990304, XP002305392 [A] 9-11 * page 372; figure 13 * | International search | [Y]JPH0425346B ; | [X]JP2599529B ; | [X]JPH09263908 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [X]JPH1112700 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [Y]US6340399 (TANAKA ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]JP6086648B |