EP1401919 - LIQUID ALKOXYSILYL-FUNCTIONAL SILICONE RESINS, METHOD FOR THEIR PREPARATION, AND CURABLE SILICONE RESIN COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 1-3, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Silicone Company, Ltd. 3rd, 4th and 8th fl., AIG Building, 1-1-3, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Hideki c/o Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd., 2-2, Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Motoshi c/o Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd., 2-2, Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 03 /
MASATOMI, Toru c/o Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd., 2-2, Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0108 / JP | [2008/31] |
Former [2004/14] | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Hideki 2-2, Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0108 / JP | ||
02 /
SASAKI, Motoshi 2-2, Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0108 / JP | |||
03 /
MASATOMI, Toru 2-2, Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0108 / JP | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2004/14] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02738840.4 | 27.06.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002JP06531 | Priority number, date | JP20010198404 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001198404 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03002634 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1401919 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1401919 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/18, C08G77/44, C08G77/10, C08G77/04 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
C08G77/38 (EP,US);
C08G77/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/10 (EP,US);
C08G77/44 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE ALKOXYSILYLGRUPPEN-ENTHALTENDE SILIKONHARZE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND HÄRTBARE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2004/14] | English: | LIQUID ALKOXYSILYL-FUNCTIONAL SILICONE RESINS, METHOD FOR THEIR PREPARATION, AND CURABLE SILICONE RESIN COMPOSITIONS | [2004/14] | French: | RESINES SILICONES LIQUIDES A FONCTIONNALITE ALCOXYSILYLE, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CES RESINES ET COMPOSITIONS DE RESINES SILICONES RETICULABLES | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2008 | BE | 30.07.2008 | CY | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | IT | 30.07.2008 | NL | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | ES | 10.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/48] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 30.07.2008 | |
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 30.07.2008 | |
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3455839 (RAUNER LAWRENCE A) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]GB2140815 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0070786 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM) [A] 1 * claims 1-8 *; | [X]US4943620 (GOMYO SHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * claims 1-12 * * column 2, line 14 - line 39 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 37 *; | [A]US5202404 (TAKARADA MITSUHIRO [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 * * column 2, line 14 - line 63 * * column 6, line 36 - line 55 *; | [A]EP0390083 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [PA]EP1172397 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1 * claims 1-8 * |