Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002315649B | Global Dossier | 04.05.2006 | B2 | Priority number | Date | DE10119469 | 12.04.2001 | DE0201438 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1494558 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2006 | B8 | EP1494558 | 13.09.2006 | B1 | EP1494558 | 12.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10119469 | 12.04.2001 | DE0201438 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50208171D1 | 26.10.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10119469 | 12.04.2001 | DE50208171 | 12.04.2002 | DE0201438 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02082938 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2006 | A8 | WO02082938 | 24.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10119469 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE339122T | 15.10.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10119469 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10119469 | 20.03.2003 | C2 | DE10119469 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10119469 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2272725T | 01.05.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10119469 | 12.04.2001 |