EP1419129 - USE OF BRANCHED-CHAIN FATTY ACIDS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF FOR THE TREATMENT OF PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D-Pharm Limited Kiryat Weizmann Science Park Rehovot 76326 / IL | [2004/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOZAK, Alexander 8 Naphtali Ben Ephraim Street 76555 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
DUVDEVANI, Revital 26/21 Tirza Street 52364 Ramat Gan / IL | 03 /
YOUNIS, Firas, M. P.O.BOX 631 30026 Kfar Arara / IL | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/21] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02741140.4 | 24.06.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002IL00502 | Priority number, date | US20010888958 | 25.06.2001 Original published format: US 888958 | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03000173 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1419129 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1419129 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20, A61P29/00 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
C07F9/11 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C233/05 (EP,US);
C07C53/128 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/16] | A61K31/20, C07C55/00 | ||
Former IPC [2004/21] | C07C55/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON VERZWEIGTKETTIGEN FETTSÄUREN UND IHRER DERIVATE ZUR SCHMERZBEHANDLUNG | [2004/21] | English: | USE OF BRANCHED-CHAIN FATTY ACIDS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF FOR THE TREATMENT OF PAIN | [2004/21] | French: | UTILISATION D'ACIDES GRAS A CHAINE RAMIFIEE ET DERIVES DE CES ACIDES GRAS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 31.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IT | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | IE | 24.06.2009 | LU | 24.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LU | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9902485 (DPHARM LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 4, line 13 - page 7, line 16 * [Y] 1-15; | [PX]WO0207669 (DPHARM LTD [IL], et al) [PX] 2-15 * page 1, line 14 - line 16 * * page 12 *; | [PX]WO0211666 (DPHARM LTD [IL], et al) [PX] 2-15 * page 1, line 8 - line 11 * * page 4, line 3 - line 21 * * page 19, line 20 *; | [PX]US2002042445 (KOZAK ALEXANDER [IL], et al) [PX] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0049] *; | [X] - BAUER J A ET AL, "Modulation of resynthesis of 1-alkyl-2-arachidonyl-glycero-3-phosphoc holine and phosphatidylinositols for interception in vivo of free arachidonic acid, lyso-PAF, diacyl-glycerols, and phosphoinositides.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (1989), Database accession no. NLM2550957, XP002367872 [X] 2-15 * abstract * | [X] - HERMETTER A ET AL, "1-O-TRITYL-SN-GLYCERO-3-PHOSPHOCHOLINE: A NEW INTERMEDIATE FOR THE FACILE PREPARATION OF MIXED-ACID 1,2-DIACYLGLYCEROPHOSPHOCHOLINES", CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS OF LIPIDS, LIMERICK, IR, (198904), vol. 50, no. 1, ISSN 0009-3084, pages 57 - 62, XP001041739 [X] 2-15 * page 57 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-3084(89)90026-1 | [Y] - HILLBOM M E, "THE PREVENTION OF ETHANOL WITHDRAWAL SEIZURES IN RATS BY DI PROPYL ACETATE", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1975), vol. 14, no. 10, ISSN 0028-3908, pages 755 - 761, XP002367880 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(75)90101-X | [ ] - PROGRESS IN CLINICAL AND BIOLOGICAL RESEARCH. 1989, (1989), vol. 308, ISSN 0361-7742, pages 455 - 462 | International search | [A]US4846991 (SUZUE SHIGETOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5278300 (HASEGAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) | by applicant | - KAWAKAMI, CLIN ORTHOP., (1998), vol. 351, pages 241 - 51 | - SAAL ET AL., SPINE, (1990), vol. 15, pages 674 - 8 |