EP1401134 - AUTOMATIC GAIN CONTROL CIRCUIT AND METHOD AND DEMODULATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/13] | AUTOMATIC GAIN CONTROL CIRCUIT AND METHOD THEREOF, AND DEMODULATION APPARATUS USING THE SAME | ||
[2007/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMORI, Kenji, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
WAKAMATSU, Masataka, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Hideaki, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
USUI, Takashi, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
SAIJO, Kazuyuki, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 06 /
TANABE, Shinichi, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 07 /
MOROHASHI, Hideo, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 08 /
FUJIMURA, Kazuhiro, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Turner, James Arthur D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02741298.0 | 25.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002JP06364 | Priority number, date | JP20010190994 | 25.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001190994 | [2004/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03001714 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1401134 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1401134 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
H03G3/3078 (EP,US);
H03G3/3052 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/31] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VERSTÄRKUNGSREGELSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN UND MODULATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/08] | English: | AUTOMATIC GAIN CONTROL CIRCUIT AND METHOD AND DEMODULATION APPARATUS | [2007/08] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE GAIN AUTOMATIQUE ET PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DEMODULATION | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/13] | AUTOMATISCHE VERSTÄRKUNGSREGELSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR UND MODULATIONSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | ||
Former [2004/13] | AUTOMATIC GAIN CONTROL CIRCUIT AND METHOD THEREOF, AND DEMODULATION APPARATUS USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2004/13] | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE GAIN AUTOMATIQUE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT, AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE DEMODULATION FAISANT INTERVENIR LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2003 | Translation filed | 12.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [AP]JP2002176411 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH11205278 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH0629942 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH11341091 (NEC CORP) |