EP1406484 - ANTI-APOPTOSIS GENES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, Iowa 50307 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMMONS, Carl, R. 4228 Holland Drive Des Moines, IA 50310 / US | 02 /
GORDON-KAMM, William, J. 3916 67th Street Urbandale, IA 50322 / US | 03 /
JOHAL, Gurmukh 4519 91st Street Urbandale, IA 50322 / US | 04 /
ACEVEDO, Pedro, A., Navarro 315 S. 4th Street Ames, IA 50010 / US | 05 /
TAO, Yumin 4605 Ashwood Drive Urbandale, IA 50322 / US | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Bentham, Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02742131.2 | 11.06.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US19114 | Priority number, date | US20010297478P | 12.06.2001 Original published format: US 297478 P | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02101079 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1406484 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/00, H01H5/10, C12N15/29, C12N15/63, C12N15/82 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8263 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTI-APOPTOSE-GENE UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2004/16] | English: | ANTI-APOPTOSIS GENES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2004/16] | French: | GENES ANTI-APOPTOSE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 15.03.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6211437 (BRIGGS STEVEN P [US], et al); | [X] - KAWAI ET AL., "Evolutionally conserved plant homologue of the bax inhibitor-1 (BI-1) gene capable of suppressing bax-induced cell death in yeast", FEBS LETTERS, (1999), vol. 464, pages 143 - 147, XP004260738 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(99)01695-6 | [X] - SANCHEZ ET AL., "AtBI-1, a plant homologue of bax inhibitor-1 suppresses bax-induced, cell death in yeast and is rapidly upregulated during wounding and pathogen challenge", THE PLANT JOURNAL, (2000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 393 - 399, XP002968581 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313x.2000.00690.x | [X] - SINGH ET AL., "Expressed sequence tags from cold-stressed maize seedings", GENBANK, (20010227), Database accession no. (BG321220), XP002968582 | [X] - KAWAT ET AL., "Evolutionally conserved plant homologue of the bax inhibitor-1 (BI-1) gene capable of suppressing bax-induced cell death in yeast", GENBANK, (20000304), Database accession no. (AB025926), XP002968583 | [XP] - KAWAI-YAMADA ET AL., "Mammalian bax-induced plant cell death can be down-regulated by overexpression of arabidopsis bax inhibitor-(AtBI-1)", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (20011009), vol. 98, no. 21, pages 12295 - 12300, XP002968584 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.211423998 |