EP1410022 - DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlycoMimetics, Inc. 101 Orchard Ridge Drive, Suite 1E Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2009/18] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Glycomimetics, Inc. 14915 Broschart Road, Suite 200 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNANI, John L. 12216 Triple Crown Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2009/17] |
Former [2004/17] | 01 /
MAGNANI, John L. 325 West Side Drive, Apartment 101 Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02742263.3 | 21.06.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002US19851 | Priority number, date | US20010300250P | 21.06.2001 Original published format: US 300250 P | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03000117 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1410022 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1410022 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61K49/00 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/3069 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
G01N2405/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | G01N33/53, C07H7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHWEIS UND BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATAKREBS | [2004/17] | English: | DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER | [2004/17] | French: | DETECTION ET TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2004/17] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2008 | 10.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2009 | BE | 06.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | IT | 06.05.2009 | NL | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | IE | 21.06.2009 | LU | 21.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | ES | 17.08.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.06.2009 | ||
LU | 21.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 17.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9703701 (GLYCOTECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 6,8,9,12 * page 8, line 21; claims 12-22 * * page 13, lines 3-5 *; | [A] - NUDELMAN E D ET AL, "A series of disialogangliosides with binary 2-3 sialosyllactosamine structure, defined by monoclonal antibody NUH2, are oncodevelopmentally regulated antigens", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19891105), vol. 264, no. 31, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 18719 - 18725, XP002961833 [A] 1-15,18 * the whole document * | [A] - SHIRAISHI T ET AL, "THE GLYCOSPHINGOLIPIDS OF HUMAN PROSTATE TISSUE", BBA - LIPIDS AND LIPID METABOLISM, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV. AMSTERDAM, NL, (1988), vol. 961, no. 2, ISSN 0005-2760, pages 160 - 169, XP008048167 [A] 1-15,18 * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2760(88)90109-9 | [A] - SATOH M ET AL, "GLYCOLIPID EXPRESSION IN PROSTATIC TISSUE AND ANALYSIS OF THE ANTIGEN RECOGNIZED BY ANTIPROSTATIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY APG1", UROLOGIA INTERNATIONALIS, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (1992), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 0042-1138, pages 20 - 24, XP008048162 [A] 1-15,18 * page 23, column 2, paragraph 1 * | [A] - LAGANA ALDO ET AL, "Determination of serum total lipid and free N-acetylneuraminic acid in genitourinary malignancies by fluorimetric high performance liquid chromatography: Relevance of free N-acetylneuraminic acid as tumour marker", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1995), vol. 243, no. 2, ISSN 0009-8981, pages 165 - 179, XP002331568 [A] 1-15,18 * page 174, paragraphs 5,6; figure 1C; tables 1,2 * * page 176, paragraphs 6,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(95)06165-7 | International search | [X] - ITAI ET AL., "Differentiation-dependent expression of I and sialyl I antigens in the developing lung of human embryos and in lung cancers", CANCER RESEARCH, (19901201), vol. 50, no. 23, pages 7603 - 7611, XP002961832 | [A] - NUDELMAN ET AL., "A series of disialogangliosides with binary 2-3 sialosyllactosamine structure, defined by monoclonal antibody NUH2, are oncodevelopmentally regulated antigens", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19891105), vol. 264, no. 31, pages 18719 - 18725, XP002961833 | [A] - KANNAGI ET AL., "Quantitative and qualitative characterization of human cancer-associated serum glycoprotein antigens expressing fucosyl or sialyl type 2 chain polylactosamine", CANCER RES., (1986), vol. 46, pages 2619 - 2626, XP002961836 | Examination | US5227160 | - TAILOR-PAPADIMITRIOU, "Report on the first international workshop on carcinoma associated mucins", INT J CANCER, (1991), vol. 49, pages 1 - 5 | - BALLANGRUD, "Response of LNCaP spheroids after treatment with an alpha-particle emitter (213Bi)-labeled anti-prostate-specific membrane antigen antibody (J591).", CANCER RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 61, pages 2008 - 2014 | - SAFFRAN, "Target antigens for prostate cancer immunotherapy.", CANC METASTASIS REV, (1999), vol. 18, pages 437 - 449 |