Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1373794
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.12.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
02.09.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.03.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
19.09.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
14.11.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
04.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
30.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|