EP1364506 - MULTICARRIER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH REDUCED COMPLEXITY CHANNEL RESPONSE ESTIMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LINNARTZ, Johan, P., M., G. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02742449.8 | 16.01.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002IB00128 | Priority number, date | EP20010200687 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01200687 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02067526 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1364506 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L25/02 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
H04L25/03821 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L25/022 (EP,US);
H04L25/0236 (EP,US);
H04L25/0244 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | MEHRTRÄGER-ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM MIT KANALANTWORTABSCHÄTZUNG MIT VERRINGERTER KOMPLEXITÄT | [2003/48] | English: | MULTICARRIER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH REDUCED COMPLEXITY CHANNEL RESPONSE ESTIMATION | [2003/48] | French: | SYSTEME D'EMISSION DE MULTI-PORTEUSES A ESTIMATION DE REPONSE DE CANAL A COMPLEXITE REDUITE | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 01.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5465276 (LARSSON LARS G [SE], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 63 - column 6, line 27 * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US5818876 (LOVE ROBERT TRISTAN [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [PX]WO0163870 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-16 * page 6, line 25 - page 9, line 16 * * page 11, line 21 - page 13, line 12 ** figures 3,6 *; | [XA] - LINNARTZ J-P M G ET AL, "DOPPLER-RESISTENT OFDM RECEIVERS FOR MOBILE MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM OF MOBILE MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, DELFT, NL, (20001109), pages 87 - 92, XP001014332 [X] 1,5,9,13 * page 88, column R, line 2 - page 89, column L, line L * * page 90, column L, line 15 - page 91, column L, line 11 * * figures 1,5 * [A] 2-4,6-8,10-12,14-16 |