EP1404881 - A GAS INJECTION LANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNOLOGICAL RESOURCES PTY. LTD. 55 Collins Street Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNNE, Martin, Joseph 24 Third Avenue West Midland, Western Australia 6056 / AU | 02 /
HARDIE, Gregory, John 345 Windermere Road Windermere, Tasmania 7252 / AU | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02742539.6 | 08.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002AU00911 | Priority number, date | AU2001PR06248 | 10.07.2001 Original published format: AU PR624801 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03006693 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404881 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404881 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/46, C21B11/00, C21B13/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
C21C5/4613 (EP,US);
C21C5/46 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | C21C5/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASSPÜLLANZE | [2004/15] | English: | A GAS INJECTION LANCE | [2004/15] | French: | LANCE D'INJECTION DE GAZ | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 12.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.04.2005 | CZ | 27.04.2005 | EE | 27.04.2005 | LI | 27.04.2005 | SK | 27.04.2005 | TR | 27.04.2005 | CY | 08.07.2005 | IE | 08.07.2005 | BG | 27.07.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | CH | 27.04.2005 | |
CZ | 27.04.2005 | ||
EE | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
SK | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
IE | 08.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CH | 27.04.2005 | |
CZ | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
SK | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
IE | 08.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | CH | 27.04.2005 | |
CZ | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
SK | 27.04.2005 | ||
IE | 08.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | CH | 27.04.2005 | |
CZ | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
IE | 08.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | CH | 27.04.2005 | |
CZ | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
IE | 08.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | CH | 27.04.2005 | |
CZ | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
BG | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 27.04.2005 | |
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
BG | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BG | 27.07.2005 | |
DK | 27.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5350158 (WHELLOCK JOHN G [US]) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [A]US5498277 (FLOYD JOHN M [AU], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [YP]WO02083958 (TECH RESOURCES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [YP] 1 * the whole document *; | [YP]US2002158377 (DUNNE MARTIN JOSEPH [AU], et al) [YP] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]GB1484745 (STEIN REFRACTORIES); | [A]US4783060 (STRUZIK ERICH [DE], et al); | [A]US4951928 (EYSN MANFRED [AT], et al); | [A]WO9702365 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) |