EP1409899 - BUSHING ARRANGEMENT FOR SEAL CAVITY PROTECTION IN ROTATING FLUID EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENVIROSEAL ENGINEERING PRODUCTS LTD. P.O. Box 538 Waverley Nova Scotia B0N 2S0 / CA | [2009/21] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states ENVIROSEAL ENGINEERING PRODUCTS LTD. P.O. Box 538 Waverley, Nova Scotia B0N 2S0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGHES, Paul, c/o Enviroseal Eng. Products Ltd. P.O. Box 538 Waverley, Nova Scotia B0N 2S0 / CA | 02 /
DUNFORD, Joseph, R. DI -- -- / CA | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Makovski, Priscilla Mary Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Makovski, Priscilla Mary BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02742605.5 | 26.06.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002CA00980 | Priority number, date | CA20012353708 | 24.07.2001 Original published format: CA 2353708 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03010451 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409899 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409899 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34, F16J15/18, F04D29/10 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
F04D29/106 (EP,US);
F04D7/04 (EP,US);
F16J15/182 (EP,US);
F16J15/3404 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2009/21] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BÜCHSENSANORDNUNG ZUM SCHUTZ DES DICHTUNGSHOHLRAUMS IN ROTIERENDEN FLUIDGERÄTEN | [2004/17] | English: | BUSHING ARRANGEMENT FOR SEAL CAVITY PROTECTION IN ROTATING FLUID EQUIPMENT | [2004/17] | French: | ENSEMBLE BAGUE POUR PROTECTION DE CAVITE D'ETANCHEITE DANS UN EQUIPEMENT A FLUIDE ROTATIF | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2035472 (RANSOME HOFFMANN POLLARD) [A] 1,7* abstract *; | [AD]US5553868 (DUNFORD JOSEPH R [CA]) [AD] 1,7 * column A; figure - *; | [AP]WO0233292 (WILHELM PRINZ [AU]) [AP] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | US5553868 | AU688977B |