EP1417074 - MANUAL MACHINE-TOOL COMPRISING A BRAKING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/52] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70422 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEHDE, Joerg Meisenweg 21/1 71144 Steinenbronn / DE | [2004/20] | Application number, filing date | 02742716.0 | 07.05.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002DE01637 | Priority number, date | DE2001134308 | 14.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10134308 | [2004/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03008150 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417074 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1417074 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24B23/03, B24B23/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
B24B23/03 (EP,US);
B24B23/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE MIT BREMSMITTEL | [2004/20] | English: | MANUAL MACHINE-TOOL COMPRISING A BRAKING MEANS | [2004/20] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL A MAIN POURVUE D'UN MOYEN DE FREINAGE | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 29.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | FI | 27.12.2006 | IE | 27.12.2006 | IT | 27.12.2006 | NL | 27.12.2006 | TR | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.03.2007 | GR | 28.03.2007 | ES | 07.04.2007 | AT | 07.05.2007 | LU | 07.05.2007 | PT | 28.05.2007 | BE | 31.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 27.12.2006 | |
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
AT | 07.05.2007 | ||
LU | 07.05.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
AT | 07.05.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
SE | 27.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3642741 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 5, line 62 - column 9, line 22 ** figures 6-8 *; | [DA]DE19952108 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * column 3, line 7 - column 6, line 3 * * figures 1-4 * |