EP1389183 - SULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2010/01] |
Former [2004/08] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HART, Terance, William Novartis Inst. for Medical Sciences, 5 Gower Place London WC1E 6BN / GB | 02 /
RITCHIE, Timothy, John Novartis Inst. for Medical Sciences, 5 Gower Place London WS1E 6BN / GB | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/08] | Grubb, Philip William Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02742997.6 | 13.05.2002 | [2004/08] | WO2002EP05240 | Priority number, date | US20010290827P | 14.05.2001 Original published format: US 290827 P | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02092556 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389183 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1389183 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/19, C07D213/55, C07D239/26, C07D257/04, A61K31/18, A61P29/00 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
C07C311/19 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C311/48 (EP,US);
C07D213/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SULFONAMIDDERIVATE | [2004/08] | English: | SULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES | [2004/08] | French: | DERIVES DE SULFONAMIDE | [2004/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | IE | 13.05.2010 | LU | 13.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/19] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 13.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 03.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6015812 (FERRARI BERNARD [FR], et al) [A] 1-9* column 3 - column 4; claims 1,23-32 *; | [A]WO0075107 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 1 - page 2; claims 1,8-11 * | Examination | DE120047 |