EP1404311 - WOUND TREATMENT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Medical AG Seesatz 6204 Sempach / CH | [2008/51] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Prontomed GmbH Am Bahndamm 70 32120 Hiddenhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHLEN, Neithard Abt-Möhler-Str. 19 35510 Butzbach / DE | 02 /
KRAMER, Axel, Prof. Georg-Engel-Str. 20 17493 Greifswald / DE | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr., et al Lang & Tomerius Postfach 15 13 24 80048 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02743052.9 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002EP05486 | Priority number, date | DE20011032817 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10132817 | [2004/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004013 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404311 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404311 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/205, A61K31/155, A61P17/02 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/205 (EP);
A61K31/155 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | A61K31/205, A61K31/155, A61P17/02, // A61K31:205, A61K31:155 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WUNDBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL | [2004/15] | English: | WOUND TREATMENT AGENT | [2004/15] | French: | PRODUIT DE TRAITEMENT DE PLAIES | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 27.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.11.2008 | FI | 05.11.2008 | GR | 06.02.2009 | LU | 17.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | FI | 05.11.2008 | |
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
LU | 17.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | FI | 05.11.2008 | |
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | FI | 05.11.2008 | |
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 05.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0087049 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-13 *siehe Zusammenfassung, Seite 4a*; | [Y]EP0513637 (GERMO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-13 *siehe Zusammenfassung, Seite 2, Zeilen 26-35, Ansprüche 1-2*; | [Y]FR2695297 (PETERS [FR]) [Y] 1-13 *siehe Zusammenfassung, Ansprüche 1,8-12*; | [Y]EP0700249 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13*Siehe Seite 2, Absatz 1, Zeilen 39-43, Seite 3, Zeilen 26-31, Ansprüche 1,5,6*; | [Y]US6045817 (ANANTHAPADMANABHAN KAVSSERY PA [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 *siehe Zusammenfassung, Spalte 3, Zeile 57 mit Spalte 4, Zeilen 1-11, Spalte 5, Zeile 40 mit Spalte 6, Zeilen 1-54*; | [Y]WO0135743 (JOHNSON S C COMM MARKETS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 *siehe Zusammenfassung, Seite 6, Zeile 10 bis einschliesslich Seite 12, Zeilen 1-8, Anspruch 1* |