Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1404311 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2008 | B1 | EP1404311 | 07.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10132817 | 06.07.2001 | EP0205486 | 17.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50212989D1 | 18.12.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10132817 | 06.07.2001 | EP0205486 | 17.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1404311T | 09.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10132817 | 06.07.2001 | EP0205486 | 17.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03004013 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10132817 | 06.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE413169T | 15.11.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10132817 | 06.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10132817 | 30.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10132817 | 06.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2318019T | 01.05.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10132817 | 06.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1404311E | 13.02.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | DE10132817 | 06.07.2001 |