EP1413006 - ANTENNA ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYLE, Kevin, R. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Scott, Kevin James, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Scott, Kevin James, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02743475.2 | 24.06.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002IB02575 | Priority number, date | GB20010017882 | 21.07.2001 Original published format: GB 0117882 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03010853 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413006 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/04 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0442 (EP,US);
H01Q13/08 (KR);
H01Q9/0421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG | [2004/18] | English: | ANTENNA ARRANGEMENT | [2004/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 17.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/30] | 26.01.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04157908 ; | [DA]EP0867967 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [DA] 4,5* column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 19; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0987789 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * figure 5 * * 3rd embodiment *; | [DX]WO0137369 (ALLGON AB [SE], et al) [DX] 1-10 * page 4, line 15 - page 7, line 6; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1113524 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 3,9 * paragraphs [0042] - [0057]; figures 2,8 *; | [A] - J-F ZÜRCHER & F.E. GARDIOL, Broadband patch antennas, BOSTON / LONDON, ARTECH HOUSE, (1995), 228380, XP002215420 [A] 1,9 * section 4.4 Matching * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920917), vol. 016, no. 447, Database accession no. (E - 1266), & JP04157908 A 19920529 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 3,9 * abstract * |