EP1410523 - SEARCHING FOR A PRE-DEFINED CODE IN A BIT STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERHARDS, Ronald Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VOS, Gus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BURCHILL, William Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02743565.0 | 08.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002IB02820 | Priority number, date | US20010903645 | 13.07.2001 Original published format: US 903645 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03007498 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1410523 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H04B1/7077 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (KR);
H04B1/70757 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | SUCHE NACH EINER VORDEFINIERTEN CODEFOLGE IN EINER BITSEQUENZ | [2004/17] | English: | SEARCHING FOR A PRE-DEFINED CODE IN A BIT STREAM | [2004/17] | French: | RECHERCHE D'UN CODE PREDEFINI DANS UN TRAIN BINAIRE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/30] | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5781543 (AULT JAN C [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 3, line 6 - column 3, line 60 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 55; figures 2,3; claims 11-3 *; | [X]EP0880238 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20 * page 3, line 35 - page 3, line 47 * * page 18, column 26 - page 18, column 47 * * page 19, line 49 - page 24, line 57; figures 5,8-10,12-14; claims 4-6 *; | [X]US6175561 (STORM BRIAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 4, line 50 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 32 - column 7, line 27; figures 2,4 *; | [PX]WO0239607 (UBINETICS LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-20 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph L * * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 2 ** figure 1; claims 1-6,10,11 * |