EP1399026 - COMPOSITION FOR COATING FRUITS, VEGETABLES AND FOWL EGGS, ESPECIALLY USEFUL FOR ORGANIC PRODUCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natratec International Ltd. P.O. Box 12 Katzerin, Z.C. 12900 / IL | [2005/49] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Biocoat Ltd. Street No. 1, Industrial Area of Katzerin 12900 Katzerin / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAHAV, Jacob 12495 Aniam / IL | 02 /
POLYANSKY, Emil Misgav St. 1/10 21802 Carmiel / IL | 03 /
WALDMAN, Daniel Hamacabim 3/45 49220 Petach Tikva / IL | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02743590.8 | 26.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002IL00514 | Priority number, date | IL20010144058 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: IL 14405801 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03001921 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1399026 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399026 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/154, A23B7/157, A23B7/16 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
A23B7/154 (EP,US);
A23B5/06 (EP,US);
A23B5/14 (EP,US);
A23B5/18 (EP,US);
A23B7/157 (EP,US);
A23B7/16 (EP,US);
Y10S118/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHUNG ZUM ÜBERZIEHEN VON FRÜCHTEN, GEMÜSEN UND GEFLÜGELEIERN, INSBESONDERE FÜR ORGANISCHE NAHRUNGSPRODUKTE | [2004/13] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR COATING FRUITS, VEGETABLES AND FOWL EGGS, ESPECIALLY USEFUL FOR ORGANIC PRODUCE | [2004/13] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR L'ENROBAGE DE FRUITS, LEGUMES ET OEUFS DE VOLAILLE, NOTAMMENT UTILE POUR DES PRODUITS BIOLOGIQUES | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2006 | FI | 11.01.2006 | DK | 11.04.2006 | SE | 11.04.2006 | LU | 26.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2008/37] |
Former [2007/45] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IT | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 11.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2153487 (SHARMA JAGAN N) [X] 1-9,14,17-22 * page 1, column 1 * * page 2, column 1, line 5 - line 15 * * page 2, column 2, line 13 - line 63 * * page 3, column 1, line 26 - line 32 * * page 3 - page 4; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US2412686 (KALMAR ARTHUR F) [X] 1-4,8,9,14,16-21 * column 1, paragraphs 1,2 ** column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 75 *; | [X]US3420790 (GASSNER SAUL ALEXANDER, et al) [X] 1-8,14,17-22 * column 2, line 70 - column 4, line 21 * * column 5 - column 6; claims 1-10 * |