EP1393064 - MULTI-LAYERED OXYGEN DETECTION SYSTEM FOR A SOLID ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. P.O. Box 464, 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, SC 29334 / US | [2010/27] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. P.O. Box 464, 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, SC 29334 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENNEDY, Thomas, C. 1403 Plantation Drive Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 02 /
HAVENS, Marvin, R. 206 Hackney Road Greer, SC 29650 / US | 03 /
SPEER, Drew, V. 204 English Oak Road Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 04 /
BARMORE, Charles, R. 113 Cumberland Drive Moore, SC 29369 / US | 05 /
ESPINEL, Karina, R. 23 Oregon Road Cortlandt Manor, NY 10567 / US | 06 /
THOMAS, Jeffrey, A. 23 Oregon Road Cortlandt Manor, NY 10567 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | von Kameke, Allard Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | von Kameke, Allard, Dr. Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02744153.4 | 15.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US15384 | Priority number, date | US20010875515 | 06.06.2001 Original published format: US 875515 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099416 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1393064 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1393064 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/22, G01N33/02 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
G01N33/02 (EP,US);
G01N31/225 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1324 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1341 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1379 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTISCHICHT SAUERSTOFF DETEKTIONSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN FESTEN ARTIKEL | [2004/10] | English: | MULTI-LAYERED OXYGEN DETECTION SYSTEM FOR A SOLID ARTICLE | [2004/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION D'OXYGENE MULTICOUCHE POUR ARTICLE SOLIDE | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.11.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10002774.7 / EP2194377 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Request for further processing for: | 23.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.08.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | BE | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
NL | 07.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8700023 (INT BIO MEDICAL IND INC [US]) [X] 13 * page 3 ** page 13, line 23 - page 15, line 10 *; | [X]EP0524021 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 12,14 * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 13 * * examples 67-100 * * example 101 *; | [X]US5358876 (INOUE YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 12,14 * columns 3-4 * * examples 64-87 * * column 10 * | Examination | WO0067014 |