Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1407005 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2006 | A4 | EP1407005 | 14.04.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0218346 | 11.06.2002 | US29730501 | 11.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003100031 | 29.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16712702 | 11.06.2002 | US29730501 | 11.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02101015 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2003 | A3 | WO02101015 | 19.12.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US29730501 | 11.06.2001 |