|
23.11.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
09.10.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2010 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
38 |