Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011153400 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2012 | A3 | WO2011153400 | 08.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US79462910 | 04.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006096173 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A8 | WO2006096173 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9358206 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2016 | B2 | US2014073570 | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48130903 | 18.12.2003 | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US201314024230 | 11.09.2013 | US81130407 | 07.06.2007 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | US56297409 | 18.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8481043 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2013 | B2 | US2010278812 | 04.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48130903 | 18.12.2003 | US79462910 | 04.06.2010 | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US81130407 | 07.06.2007 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8541359 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2013 | B2 | US2010009921 | 14.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48130903 | 18.12.2003 | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US81130407 | 07.06.2007 | US56297409 | 18.09.2009 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8329760 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2012 | B2 | US2009286715 | 19.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48130903 | 18.12.2003 | US50542109 | 17.07.2009 | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7816318 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2010 | B2 | US2007265191 | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48130903 | 18.12.2003 | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US81130407 | 07.06.2007 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7244703 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2007 | B2 | US2005232867 | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004176476 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48130903 | 18.12.2003 | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013528623 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US79462910 | 04.06.2010 | WO2011US39007 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004535432 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2575888 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | A4 | EP2575888 | 10.04.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US79462910 | 04.06.2010 | WO2011US39007 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2283850 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP2283850 | 16.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05724894 | 07.03.2005 | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1773369 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2008 | A4 | EP1773369 | 18.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | WO2005US07449 | 07.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011261326 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US79462910 | 04.06.2010 | WO2011US39007 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011200188 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | AU2011200188 | 18.01.2011 | AU2005328680 | 07.03.2005 | WO2005US07449 | 07.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005328680C | Global Dossier | 15.03.2012 | C1 | AU2005328680B | 31.03.2011 | B2 | AU2005328680 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | WO2005US07449 | 07.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1408896 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B1 | EP1408896 | 24.02.2010 | A4 | EP1408896 | 21.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2451839 | 06.08.2013 | C | CA2451839 | 03.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0219849 | 24.06.2002 | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2566496 | 30.08.2011 | C | CA2566496 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | WO2005US07449 | 07.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2745782 | 21.01.2014 | C | CA2745782 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89546504 | 05.03.2004 | CA2566496 | 07.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2801554 | 08.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US79462910 | 04.06.2010 | WO2011US39007 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03000158 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5368410B | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | B2 | JP2011006487 | 13.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4785960B | Global Dossier | 05.10.2011 | B2 | JP2010001305 | 07.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI331522B | 11.10.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | US30029301 | 22.06.2001 | Type | Divisional application | Application refused : 26.01.2013 |