EP1408896 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPEX Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2 Holland Way Exeter, NH 03833 / US | [2009/11] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Bentley Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Bentley Park, 2 Holland Way Exeter, NH 03833 / US | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Bentley Pharmaceuticals, Inc 65 Lafayette Road, 3rd Floor North Hampton, NH 03862-2403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GYURIK, Robert, J. 12 Ashbrook Road Exeter, NH 03833 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Chajmowicz, Marion Becker & Associés 25, Rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Chajmowicz, Marion Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/30] | Chajmowicz, Marion Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/17] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 02744546.9 | 24.06.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002US19849 | Priority number, date | US20010300293P | 22.06.2001 Original published format: US 300293 P | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03000158 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1408896 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1408896 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
A61K9/107 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61K47/22 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | A61F6/06, A61F9/02, A61F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2004/17] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2004/17] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12176710.7 Application refused : 26.01.2013 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 26.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.2016 | BE | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | IT | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | IE | 24.06.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
IE | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0272097 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [Y] 1-20,24-27 * page 3, line 1 - line 34 * * example - * * claim - *; | [E]WO03028702 (MACROCHEM CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-5,8,14-17,24 * page 2, line 10 - line 29 * * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 26 * * example - * * claim - *; | [Y] - MITRA RANJANA ET AL, "Lipid emulsions as vehicles for enhanced nasal delivery of insulin", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS (KIDLINGTON), (20000915), vol. 205, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 127 - 134, XP002563306 [Y] 1-20,24-27 * abstract * * paragraph [02.3] * * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(00)00506-8 | [A] - TAKALA A ET AL, "Pharmacokinetic comparison of intravenous and intranasal administration of oxycodone", ACTA ANAESTHESIOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA, (1997), vol. 41, no. 2, ISSN 0001-5172, pages 309 - 312, XP002563307 [A] 1-27 * abstract * * page 312, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-6576.1997.tb04684.x | International search | [Y]US5023252 (HSEIH DEAN [US]); | [Y]US5989535 (NAYAK SMITA [US]) | Examination | - BIBETTE J ET AL, "Stability Criteria for Emulsions", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, AMERICAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, US, (19921019), vol. 69, no. 16, doi:10.1103/PHYSREVLETT.69.2439, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 2439 - 2443, XP003014313 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.69.2439 |