EP1425212 - CONSTRUCTIVE DISPOSITION OF ADJUSTMENT OF THE REMOVABLE LATERAL FINS IN SURFBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garcia, Antonio Rua Domingo Pedro Hermes, 10 88111-330 São José / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Garcia, Antonio Rua Domingo Pedro Hermes, 10, Barreiros CEP-88111-330 Florianopolis / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Thurgood, Alexander John, et al Cabinet Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | [2006/31] |
Former [2004/24] | Richebourg, Michel François, et al Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 02744959.4 | 17.07.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002BR00101 | Priority number, date | BR20010101826 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: BR 0101826 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018395 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425212 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/79, B63B41/00 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B63B32/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTIVE EINSTELLANORDNUNG FÜR ENTFERNBARE SEITENFINNEN AN SURFBOARDS | [2004/24] | English: | CONSTRUCTIVE DISPOSITION OF ADJUSTMENT OF THE REMOVABLE LATERAL FINS IN SURFBOARD | [2004/24] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION DE REGLAGE DES DERIVES LATERALES AMOVIBLES D'UNE PLANCHE DE SURF | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/30] | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5567190 (OATES KENNETH W [US]); | [A]WO0032466 (MILNE JOHN DE COURCEY [AU]); | [A]US4493665 (LIDDLE EDWARD M [US]); | [A]EP0834451 (SUNBUM PTY LIMITED [AU]); | [A]WO9921755 (PAT TECH PTY LTD [AU], et al) |