09.01.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
19.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
01.02.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
26.01.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.01.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.09.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2007 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
09.05.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.02.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
21.09.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.08.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.09.2005 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
09.09.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
09.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
11.04.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.02.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
18.02.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
11.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|