EP1392902 - DEVICE FOR THE TRANSFER OF MOVEMENTS AND FORCES IN PARTICULAR IN DOBBY LOOMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindauer Dornier GmbH Rickenbacher Strasse 119 88131 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states LINDAUER DORNIER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H Rickenbacher Strasse 119 88131 Lindau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUPFLIN, Fritz Sorgersweg 7 88131 Lindau / DE | [2004/10] | Application number, filing date | 02745092.3 | 25.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002DE01935 | Priority number, date | DE2001127098 | 02.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127098 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02099171 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392902 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D03D1/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
F16H19/006 (EP,US);
D03C1/14 (EP,US);
D03C1/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BEWEGUNGEN UND KRÄFTEN, INSBESONDERE IN SCHAFTWEBMASCHINEN | [2004/10] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE TRANSFER OF MOVEMENTS AND FORCES IN PARTICULAR IN DOBBY LOOMS | [2004/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSFERER DES MOUVEMENTS ET DES FORCES, NOTAMMENT DANS DES METIERS A TISSER A RATIERE | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 09.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH549668 (ELITEX ZAVODY TEXTILNIHO) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,8 *; | [A]DE3526240 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [A] 1,3,8-10 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE871690 (STAEUBLI GEB & CO) [A] 1,3,4,8-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3267812 (HUNKELER ERNST J [US]) [A] 1,3-7,10 * figure - *; | [A]US3021721 (HOOVEN FREDERICK J) [A] 1,3-7,10 * figure - *; | [A]US4324148 (SILDVE ANTS) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE857629 (RUETI AG MASCHF) [A] * figure 2 *; | [A]DE579964 (ARNOLD STAUB) [A] * figure 1 * |