EP1509972 - CURRENT LEAD FOR SUPERCONDUCTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prysmian S.p.A. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | [2008/49] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Prysmian Cavi e Sistemi Energia S.r.l. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 10 20123 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORSARO, Pietro Via XX Settembre 2 Bis I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT | 02 /
CAVALLERI, Gianangelo Via Trento 28 I-24040 Canonica D'Adda (BG)o / IT | [2005/24] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
CORSARO, Pietro Via XX Settembre 2 Bis I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT | ||
02 /
CAVALLERI, Gianangelo Via Sciesa Amatore, 1 I-20063 Cernusco Sul Naviglio / IT | Representative(s) | Checcacci, Giorgio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Checcacci, Giorgio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/10] | Checcacci, Giorgio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/09] | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni, et al Pirelli & C. S.p.A., Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milan / IT | Application number, filing date | 02745331.5 | 31.05.2002 | [2005/09] | WO2002EP05944 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03103094 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509972 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/68 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
H02G15/34 (EP,US);
H01F6/065 (EP,US);
H01R4/68 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMZUFÜHRUNG FÜR SUPRALEITENDE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2005/09] | English: | CURRENT LEAD FOR SUPERCONDUCTING APPARATUS | [2005/09] | French: | CONDUCTEUR DE COURANT POUR DISPOSITIF SUPRACONDUCTEUR | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4477689 (OGASAHARA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,21 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 37 *; | [A]US5298679 (WU JIING-LIANG [US], et al); | [A]GB2294534 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | Examination | EP0596249 |