EP1407436 - DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GöLLINGER, Harald Heinrich-Kremp-Strasse 15 38350 Helmstedt / DE | 02 /
MARSCHALL, Jens Am Thieberg 1 38170 Schöppenstedt / DE | 03 /
TENZER, Axel Kleine Flage 2 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 04 /
MAURER, Markus Birkenweg 2 85113 Böhmfeld / DE | 05 /
VON HOLT, Volker Spitzwegstrasse 26 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 06 /
ANKLAM, Carsten Querumer Strasse 37 38104 Braunsschweig / DE | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Enno, et al Tegel & Meyer Patentanwälte Planegger Str. 16 82110 Germering / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Meyer, Enno, Dr., et al Augsburger Strasse 24 82110 Germering / DE | ||
Former [2004/16] | Meyer, Enno, Dr., et al c/o Jung HML Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02745369.5 | 07.06.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002EP06271 | Priority number, date | DE20011032386 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10132386 | [2004/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005325 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407436 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1407436 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
B60T7/22 (EP);
B60W10/18 (EP);
B60W40/08 (EP);
B62D15/0265 (EP);
G01S13/931 (EP);
G08G1/16 (EP);
B60T2201/02 (EP);
B60T2201/03 (EP);
B60T2201/12 (EP);
B60W10/20 (EP);
B60W2554/00 (EP);
B60W30/09 (EP);
B60W40/09 (EP);
B60W50/16 (EP);
G01S2013/93185 (EP);
G01S2013/932 (EP);
G01S2013/9322 (EP);
G01S2013/9323 (EP);
G01S2013/9324 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/36] |
Former [2004/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM | [2004/16] | English: | DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM | [2004/16] | French: | SYSTEME D'ASSISTANCE DE CONDUCTEUR | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 27.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04019232.0 / EP1486933 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.09.2005 | IT | 07.09.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 07.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5189619 (ADACHI KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, lines 50-55 * * column 2, lines 30-40 * * column 8, lines 40-50 *; | [A]GB2268608 (NORM PACIFIC AUTOMAT CORP [TW]) [A] 1 * figures 4,7 * * page 9, lines 20-25 * * page 10, lines 1-25 *; | [A]WO9514939 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, lines 5-15 * * page 9, lines 10-25 *; | [A]US5529138 (SHAW DAVID C H [US], et al) [A] 1* column 3, lines 1-35 *; | [A]EP0735517 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 35-60 *; | [A]GB2320326 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * figure 4 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]US5983161 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, lines 5-15,45-55 * * column 6, lines 1-10,50-70 * * column 7, lines 5-10,65-70 * * column 9, lines 25-55 * * column 11, lines 30-35 * * column 14, lines 30-40 * * column 15, lines 15-25 *; | [A]US6049747 (NAKAJIMA MASATO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 50-70 * * column 2, lines 5-10 *; | [A]EP1090800 (SARTI MARCO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 5-40 * * column 6, lines 30-40 *; | [A]US6225891 (LYONS CHRISTOPHER T [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 60-70 * * column 2, lines 20-35 * * column 4, lines 5-30 * | by applicant | DE3830790 | DE4302527 | EP0582236 | DE19647283 | EP0545437 |