EP1413305 - ARYL (OR HETEROARYL) AZOLYLCARBYNOL DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [2006/22] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCE-VIDAL, Ramon Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 E-08041 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
ANDALUZ-MATARO, Blas Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 E-08041 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
FRIGOLA-CONSTANSA, Jordi Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 E-08041 Barcelona / ES | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 02745440.4 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002ES00326 | Priority number, date | ES20010001587 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: ES 200101587 | [2004/18] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004022 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413305 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1413305 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, A61K31/4155, A61P13/10 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/4196 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,ES,KR,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/4155 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61P13/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | 03.02.2004 | LT | 03.02.2004 | LV | 03.02.2004 | MK | 03.02.2004 | RO | 03.02.2004 | SI | 03.02.2004 | Title | German: | ARYL- (ODER HETEROARYL-) AZOLYLCARBYNOLDERIVATVE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ | [2004/18] | English: | ARYL (OR HETEROARYL) AZOLYLCARBYNOL DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE | [2004/18] | French: | DERIVES D'ARYL(OU HETEROARYL)AZOLYLCARBINOLES UTILISES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2004 | Translation filed | 03.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 31.05.2006 | TR | 31.05.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | [2011/46] |
Former [2009/42] | TR | 31.05.2006 | |
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | GR | 01.09.2006 | |
Former [2007/45] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/38] | IT | 31.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4416894 (WOODHOUSE CHRISTOPHER R J [GB]); | [X]ES2137136 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]); | [X]ES2150378 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]); | [X]ES2150353 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) |