EP1404263 - APPARATUS FOR RELIEVING THE SYMPTOMS OF DEEP VEIN THROMBOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENVIRONMENTAL SEALS LIMITED Envirograf House, Barfreston Nr. Dover Kent CT15 7JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states ENVIRONMENTAL SEALS LIMITED Envirograf House, Barfreston Nr. Dover, Kent CT15 7JG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARD, Derek Alfred Warcott Lodge, Roman Road Maydensole, Dover CT15 5HR / GB | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Fry, Alan Valentine, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Gables, Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Fry, Alan Valentine, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Gables, Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02745566.6 | 02.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002GB03038 | Priority number, date | GB20010016484 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: GB 0116484 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03003955 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404263 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404263 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/02, A63B21/008 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
A61F7/03 (EP,US);
A63B21/008 (EP,US);
A63B22/0056 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0001 (EP,US);
A61F2007/023 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0273 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0292 (EP,US);
A61H1/0237 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0228 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0242 (EP,US);
A61H2201/025 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0257 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0278 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1284 (EP,US);
A61H2209/00 (EP,US);
A61H7/001 (EP,US);
A61H7/002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR LINDERUNG DER SYMPTOME DER THROMBOSE TIEFLIEGENDER VENEN | [2004/15] | English: | APPARATUS FOR RELIEVING THE SYMPTOMS OF DEEP VEIN THROMBOSIS | [2004/15] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SOULAGER LES SYMPTOMES DE THROMBOSE VEINEUSE PROFONDE | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 04.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2004 | BE | 24.11.2004 | BG | 24.11.2004 | CH | 24.11.2004 | CZ | 24.11.2004 | EE | 24.11.2004 | FI | 24.11.2004 | FR | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | LI | 24.11.2004 | NL | 24.11.2004 | SK | 24.11.2004 | TR | 24.11.2004 | DK | 24.02.2005 | GR | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | DE | 25.02.2005 | ES | 06.03.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | CY | 02.07.2005 | LU | 02.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/38] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
EE | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
IT | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.07.2005 | ||
LU | 02.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
EE | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.07.2005 | ||
LU | 02.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
EE | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
EE | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
SK | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 24.11.2004 | |
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1491572 (LUCKEY HERIBERT) [A] 1,9 * column 5, paragraph 6 - column 6, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US3987506 (MARKWITZ BERNHARD) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 4 - line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9217897U (LANGENBECK KURT [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column W *; | [A]US5415624 (WILLIAMS STEVE [US]) [A] 1,9* column 3, line 6 - line 16; figure 5 * | by applicant | GB2263405 | GB2271060 | GB2327888 |