|
01.08.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Refund of fees (PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |