EP1417648 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE REPRESENTATION BY GEOMETRIC AND BRIGHTNESS MODELING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vimatix Technologies Ltd. Ernst & Young Trust Corp (BVI) Ltd., P.O. Box 3340 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOMDIN, Yosef 57/7 Hanasi Harishon Street 76303 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
ELICHAI, Yoram 13 Yaara Street 85338 Lehavim / IL | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/20] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 02745776.1 | 11.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002IL00564 | Priority number, date | US20010902643 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: US 902643 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03007487 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1417648 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00, G06T15/40, G06T5/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04B1/52 (EP,US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06T7/194 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDREPRÄSENTATION DURCH GEOMETRISCHE UND HELLIGKEITSMODELLIERUNG | [2004/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE REPRESENTATION BY GEOMETRIC AND BRIGHTNESS MODELING | [2004/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REPRESENTATION D'IMAGES PAR MODELISATION PAR LA GEOMETRIE ET LA BRILLANCE | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 09.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/48] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6008820 (CHAUVIN JOSEPH W [US], et al); | [X] - AMINI JAVID D.SC., Model analysis of RBC flow through diverging and converging microvascular bifucations, THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, (1994), pages 1 - 133, XP002959438 |