EP1405560 - IL-18 TRANSGENIC ANIMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 27 Kanda Nishiki-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8444 / JP | For all designated states Nakanishi, Kenji 7-7-7, Nakayamasakuradai Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-0877 / JP | For all designated states Mizutani, Hitoshi 10-41, Oozono-cho Tsu-shi Mie 514-0046 / JP | [2011/42] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 27 Kanda Nishiki-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8444 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakanishi, Kenji 7-7-7, Nakayamasakuradai Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0877 / JP | |||
For all designated states Mizutani, Hitoshi 10-41, Oozono-cho Tsu-shi, Mie 514-0046 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZUTANI, Hitoshi 10-41, Ozono-cho Tsu-shi, Mie 514-0046 / JP | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr. Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02745959.3 | 11.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002JP07047 | Priority number, date | JP20010212218 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001212218 | [2004/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005811 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405560 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405560 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, A61K45/00, A61P17/00, A61P37/08 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
G01N33/6869 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0325 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | IL-18 TRANSGENES TIER | [2004/15] | English: | IL-18 TRANSGENIC ANIMAL | [2004/15] | French: | ANIMAL TRANSGENIQUE IL-18 | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | Translation filed | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2011 | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | IE | 11.07.2012 | LU | 11.07.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [PY]WO0195710 (NAKANISHI KENJI [JP], et al) [PY] 1-8,10 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MEE J B ET AL, "HUMAN KERATINOCYTES CONSTITUTIVELY PRODUCE BUT DO NOT PROCESS INTERLEUKIN-18", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, XX, XX, (200008), vol. 143, no. 2, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 330 - 336, XP009065628 [Y] 1-8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2133.2000.03759.x | [Y] - YAMANAKA K ET AL, "SKIN-SPECIFIC CASPASE-1-TRANSGENIC MICE SHOW CUTANEOUS APOPTOSIS AND PRE-ENDOTOXIN SHOCK CONDITION WITH A HIGH SERUM LEVEL OF IL-18", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (20000715), vol. 165, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 997 - 1003, XP002946985 [Y] 1-8,10 * the whole document * | [T] - KONISHI HIROSHI ET AL, "IL-18 contributes to the spontaneous development of atopic dermatitis-like inflammatory skin lesion independently of IgE/stat6 under specific pathogen-free conditions", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020820), vol. 99, no. 17, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11340 - 11345, XP002378293 [T] 1-8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.152337799 | [T] - SHIOHARA T ET AL, "Animal models for atopic dermatitis: are they relevant to human disease?", JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGICAL SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, SHANNON, IR, (200410), vol. 36, no. 1, ISSN 0923-1811, pages 1 - 9, XP004603012 [T] 1-8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jdermsci.2004.02.013 | International search | [AP]WO0195710 (NAKANISHI KENJI [JP], et al); | [A] - YAMANAKA K. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, pages 997 - 1003, XP002946985 | [A] - HOSHINO T. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (20010615), vol. 166, pages 7014 - 7018, XP002956672 | [A] - OSAKI T. ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1999), vol. 6, pages 808 - 815, XP002956673 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300908 |