EP1481060 - POLYNUCLEOTIDE ENCODING A NOVEL TRP CHANNEL FAMILY MEMBER, TRP-PLIK2, AND SPLICE VARIANTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company P.O. Box 4000, Route 206 and Provinceline Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Ning 926 Rhoads Drive Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Jian 121 York Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
FEDER, John 277 Dutchtown Zion Road Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 04 /
WU, Shujian 972 Ithan Lane Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | 05 /
CHANG, Han 2 Ann's Court Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | 06 /
LEE, Liana 8 Petunia Drive Apt. 1J North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | 07 /
BLANAR, Michael 1325 Summerhill Drive Malvern, PA 19355 / US | 08 /
BOL, David 1467 Franklin Road Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02746429.6 | 22.05.2002 | [2004/49] | WO2002US16164 | Priority number, date | US20010292599P | 22.05.2001 Original published format: US 292599 P | US20020362944P | 08.03.2002 Original published format: US 362944 P | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02094999 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1481060 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C12N15/00, C07K14/00, C07H21/04 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | 17.12.2003 | LT | 17.12.2003 | LV | 17.12.2003 | MK | 17.12.2003 | RO | 17.12.2003 | SI | 17.12.2003 | Title | German: | EIN NEUES MITGLIED DER TRP-KANAL-FAMILIE CODIERENDES POLYNUKLEOTID, TRP-PLIK2, SOWIE SPLEISSVARIANTEN DAVON | [2004/49] | English: | POLYNUCLEOTIDE ENCODING A NOVEL TRP CHANNEL FAMILY MEMBER, TRP-PLIK2, AND SPLICE VARIANTS THEREOF | [2004/49] | French: | POLYNUCLEOTIDE CODANT UN NOUVEAU MEMBRE DE LA FAMILLE DES CANAUX TRP, TRP-PLIK2, ET VARIANT D'EPISSAGE DE CE POLYNUCLEOTIDE | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/02] | 14.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO02083712 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X] - "Homo sapiens channel kinase 2 (CHAK2) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20010410), Database accession no. AF350881, URL: EBI, XP002332361 [X] 1,5,10,14,18 * the whole document * | [AD] - RUNNELS L W ET AL, "TRP-PLIK, a bifunctional protein with kinase and ion channel activities", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (20010209), vol. 291, no. 5506, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1043 - 1047, XP002233691 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1058519 | International search | [X]WO0040614 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al); | [X] - RYAZANOV ET AL, "Alpha-kinases: a new class of protein kinases with a novel catalytic domain", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (19990128), vol. 9, no. 2, pages R43 - R45, XP002209314 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(99)80006-2 | Examination | - RYAZANOV A.G., "Homo sapiens channel kinase 2 (CHAK2) mRNA, complete cds", EMBL, EBI, (20010410), Database accession no. AF350881, URL: EBI |