EP1432962 - MICROMACHINED SILICON TUNED COUNTERBALANCED ACCELEROMETER-GYRO WITH QUADRATURE NULLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 21240 Burbank Boulevard, Bldg. 35 Woodland Hills California 91367 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 21240 Burbank Boulevard, Bldg. 35 Woodland Hills, California 91367 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, Robert, E. 21847 Ybarra Road Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US | 02 /
WYSE, Stanley, F. 4610 Alonzo Avenue Encino, CA 91316 / US | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02746602.8 | 20.06.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002US19579 | Priority number, date | US20010971345 | 03.10.2001 Original published format: US 971345 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03029754 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1432962 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01P15/125, G01P15/13 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
G01C19/5747 (EP,US);
G01P15/097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS SILIZIUM MIKROHERGESTELLTER, ABGESTIMMTER UND AUSGEGLICHENER BESCHLEUNIGUNGSSENSOR-KREISEL MIT QUADRATURUNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2004/27] | English: | MICROMACHINED SILICON TUNED COUNTERBALANCED ACCELEROMETER-GYRO WITH QUADRATURE NULLING | [2004/27] | French: | GYROSCOPE-ACCELEROMETRE EQUILIBRES ACCORDES EN SILICIUM MICRO-USINE A EXTINCTION EN QUADRATURE | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 16.01.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5392650 (O'BRIEN BENEDICT B [US], et al) [A] 1* column 7, line 6 - column 8, line 13; figure 2 * | by applicant | US20010778434 | US20010915026 |