EP1415017 - ROTATING SUSCEPTOR AND METHOD OF PROCESSING SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOORE EPITAXIAL, INC. 1905 N. MacArthur Drive Tracy, CA 95376-2833 / US | [2007/14] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Moore Epitaxial, Inc. 1905 N. MacArthur Drive Tracy, CA 95376-2833 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKAWA, Katsuhito 776 Portswood Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/19] | Gill, David Alan W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02746957.6 | 09.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002US21809 | Priority number, date | US20010927744 | 09.08.2001 Original published format: US 927744 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014414 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415017 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415017 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/458, C30B25/12 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
C30B25/12 (EP,US);
C23C16/4584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2007/01] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHBARER SUSZEPTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON SUBSTRATEN | [2004/19] | English: | ROTATING SUSCEPTOR AND METHOD OF PROCESSING SUBSTRATES | [2004/19] | French: | SUSCEPTEUR ROTATIF ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRATS | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 01.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2001168034 ; | [XA]US5795448 (HURWITT STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,24-27 * column 3, line 57 - column 5, line 67 * [A] 6-23,28-45; | [X]EP0957185 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 38-45 * paragraphs [0020] , [0024] - [0027] *; | [YA]JPS63266072 ; | [Y]FR2733253 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 34 * page 12, line 34 - page 13, line 10; figure 8C * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001168034 A 20010622 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-5,24-27 * abstract * [Y] 6-10,28-30,32,34 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890222), vol. 013, no. 079, Database accession no. (C - 571), & JP63266072 A 19881102 (HITACHI ELECTRONICS ENG CO LTD) [Y] 6-10,28-30,32 * abstract * [A] 11-13 |