EP1399409 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NESTLER, Gerhard Richtergasse 1/9 A-1070 Wien / AT | 02 /
RAUH, Ulrich An der kurzen Gewanne 29 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 03 /
SCHRÖDER, Jürgen Niedererdstrasse 20 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2004/17] |
Former [2004/13] | 01 /
NESTLER, Gerhard Richtergasse 1/9 A-1070 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
RAUH, Ulrich Albert-Einstein-Allee 37 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | |||
03 /
SCHRÖDER, Jürgen Niedererdstrasse 20 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/44] | Application number, filing date | 02747325.5 | 28.05.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002EP05821 | Priority number, date | DE2001127941 | 08.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127941 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02100815 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399409 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399409 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/54, C07C213/10, C07C219/08, C07C213/06 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
C07C213/10 (EP,US);
C07C213/06 (EP,US);
C07C67/54 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C213/06, C07C219/08 (US,EP);
C07C213/10, C07C219/08 (US,EP);
C07C67/54, C07C69/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/13] | C07C67/60, C07C69/54, C07C213/06, C07C67/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (METH)ACRYLSÄUREESTERN | [2004/13] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID ESTERS | [2004/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ESTERS D'ACIDE (METH)ACRYLIQUE | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2009 | Observations by third parties | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | AT | 28.05.2013 | IE | 28.05.2013 | LU | 28.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
AT | 28.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
AT | 28.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 31.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XDA]EP0906902 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [XD] 1-5,10,11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0017] - [0024] , [0035] - paragraph [0044]; examples I-1 * * paragraphs [0131] , [0132]; claims 1,2 * [A] 6-9,12; | [A]BR8701337 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 88-300074, XP002088821 & BRPI8701337 A 19880927 (CIQUINE CIA PETROQU) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |