EP1397339 - (ETHYLENE)-(PROPYLENE)-TRIAMINEPENTAACETIC ACID DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION, AND THEIR USE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2004/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHMANN, Lutz Bornemannstr. 6 13359 Berlin / DE | 02 /
NIEDBALLA, Ulrich Gosslerstr. 20a 14195 Berlin / DE | 03 /
PLATZEK, Johannes Grottkauerstr. 55 12621 Berlin / DE | 04 /
FRIEBE, Matthias Antonienstr. 31 13403 Berlin / DE | 05 /
HILGER, Christoph, Stephan Langenauer Weg 24 13503 Berlin / DE | 06 /
MERBACH, André, E. Ch. du Fau-blanc 20a CH-1009 Pully / CH | 07 /
JAKAB TOTH, Eva Av. du Tir-Fédéral 87 CH-1022 Chavennes-Renens / CH | 08 /
RULOFF, Robert Av. du Tir-Fédéral 85 CH-1022 Chavennes-Renens / CH | 09 /
LAUS, Sabrina Ch. de Boisy 29A CH-1004 Lausanne / CH | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Teipel, Stephan, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02747430.3 | 24.06.2002 | [2004/12] | WO2002EP06963 | Priority number, date | US20010300479P | 22.06.2001 Original published format: US 300479 P | DE2001133435 | 10.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10133435 | US20010305936P | 17.07.2001 Original published format: US 305936 P | EP20010117355 | 18.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01117355 | US20010328108P | 10.10.2001 Original published format: US 328108 P | US20010335106P | 23.10.2001 Original published format: US 335106 P | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03000647 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1397339 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/16, C07C337/06, C07C233/43, C07C331/28, C07C229/76, C07D207/452, A61K49/04, A61K49/08, A61K49/22, A61K51/04, A61K31/28, A61K47/48 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
C07D207/452 (EP,US);
A61K49/085 (EP,US);
A61K49/103 (EP,US);
A61K49/106 (EP,US);
A61K49/14 (EP,US);
A61K49/16 (EP,US);
A61K51/0478 (EP,US);
A61K51/0482 (EP,US);
A61K51/1069 (EP,US);
A61K51/1093 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07C229/16 (EP,US);
C07C229/76 (EP,US);
C07C233/43 (EP,US);
C07C331/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | (ETHYLENE)-(PROPYLENE)-TRIAMINOPENTAESSIGSÄURE DERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG PHARMAZEUTISCHER WIRKSTOFFE | [2004/12] | English: | (ETHYLENE)-(PROPYLENE)-TRIAMINEPENTAACETIC ACID DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION, AND THEIR USE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS | [2004/12] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDE ETHYLENE PROPYLENE TRIAMINO-PENTAACETIQUE, UN PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT, ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LA PRODUCTION D'AGENTS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2004/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/27] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PY]US6303761 (WANG YUN-MING [TW], et al) [PY] 1-49,51,52 *the whole document*; | [DY]US5124471 (GANSOW OTTO A [US], et al) [DY] 1-49,51,52 *the whole document*; | [DY]US4831175 (GANSOW OTTO A [US], et al) [DY] 1-49,51,52 * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 40; claim - *; | [DY]EP0279307 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [DY] 1-49,51,52 * page 8 - page 12; claim - * | [DY] - WANG Y-M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND COMPLEXATION OF GD3+, CA2+, CU2+ AND ZN2+ BY 3,6,10-TRI(CARBOXYMETHYL)-3,6,10-TRIAZADODECANEDIOIC ACID", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (1998), no. 24, ISSN 1472-7773, pages 4113 - 4118, XP001055165 [DY] 1-49,51,52 *the whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a805837g | [Y] - PATHARE P M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND RADIOLABELING OF A BIOTIN-CHX-B CHELATE FOR BI-213", JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, SUSSEX, GB, (1998), vol. 41, no. 7, ISSN 0362-4803, pages 595 - 603, XP000922982 [Y] 1-49,51,52 *introduction and "results and discussion"* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1344(199807)41:7<595::AID-JLCR116>3.0.CO;2-O |