EP1415041 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE DOSAGE OF BINDING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corenso United OY Ltd. P.O. Box 194 28101 Pori / FI | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÖRNÄS, Mikael Ahvenkuja 20 FIN-28300 Pori / FI | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Saijonmaa, Olli-Pekka Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Saijonmaa, Olli-Pekka Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 02747482.4 | 02.08.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002FI00651 | Priority number, date | FI20010001602 | 03.08.2001 Original published format: FI 20011602 | [2004/19] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03012201 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415041 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/50, D21H23/00, D21H23/78, D21H17/28 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
D21H23/28 (EP,US);
D21H17/26 (EP,US);
D21H17/28 (EP,US);
D21H23/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BINDEMITTELDOSIERUNG | [2004/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE DOSAGE OF BINDING AGENT | [2004/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE POUR LIANT | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2003 | Translation filed | 18.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 16.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/52] | 08.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9522655 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]); | [X]US6063450 (BERNERT RICHARD [DE], et al); | [X]EP0373276 (OGILVIE AQUITAINE S A [FR]); | [Y]WO9932721 (JEFFERSON SMURFIT CORP U S [US], et al); | [A]WO9605373 (CHEMISOLV LTD [GB], et al) |