EP1414812 - HYDROXAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | [2006/08] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DYKE, Hazel, Joan, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire, SL1 3WE / GB | 02 /
WATSON, Robert, John, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire, SL1 3WE / GB | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John Celltech R&D Limited Patent Department 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Thompson, John Celltech R&D Limited Patent Deparment 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02747621.7 | 07.08.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002GB03656 | Priority number, date | GB20010019396 | 09.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0119396 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014101 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414812 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414812 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D309/08, A61K31/445, A61P35/00 | [2004/19] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | 09.02.2004 | LT | 09.02.2004 | LV | 09.02.2004 | MK | 09.02.2004 | RO | 09.02.2004 | SI | 09.02.2004 | Title | German: | HYDROXAMSÄURE-DERIVATE | [2004/19] | English: | HYDROXAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES | [2004/19] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDE HYDROXAMIQUE | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.02.2006 | CZ | 22.02.2006 | EE | 22.02.2006 | FI | 22.02.2006 | SK | 22.02.2006 | TR | 22.02.2006 | BG | 22.05.2006 | DK | 22.05.2006 | GR | 23.05.2006 | LU | 07.08.2006 | IE | 08.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 22.02.2006 | |
CZ | 22.02.2006 | ||
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
LU | 07.08.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
LU | 07.08.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 22.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9924399 (DARWIN DISCOVERY LTD [GB]) [DY] 1-8 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 13; examples 37,39 *; | [Y]WO0046221 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * examples 17,25; claim 11 *; | [Y] - BARTA T. E. ET AL., "Synthesis and Activity of Selective MMP Inhibitors with an Aryl Backbone", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20001218), vol. 10, no. 24, pages 2815 - 2817, XP000443235 [Y] 1-8 * page 2815, right hand col., last paragraph and page 2817, left hand col. * | [PY] - BARTA, T. E. ET AL, "Selective, orally active MMP inhibitors with an aryl backbone", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS (2001), 11(18), 2481-2483, (20010917), XP002215845 [PY] 1-8 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00487-5 |